EP3401784 - MULTICORE PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tredzone SAS 4 rue de Marivaux 75002 Paris / FR | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILED, Slim 153 rue Montmartre 75002 Paris / FR | 02 /
HABRA, Alain c/o Tredzone 67 rue de Dunkerque 75009 Paris / FR | 03 /
BECHARA, Charly c/o Tredzone 67 rue de Dunkerque 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Nicolle, Olivier Ipon Global 29, boulevard Georges Seurat 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 17170721.9 | 11.05.2017 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3401784 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/54 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
G06F9/5061 (EP);
G06F9/544 (EP);
G06F9/545 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIKERNVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/46] | English: | MULTICORE PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2018/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT MULTICORE | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007146343 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 5* abstract *; | [A]US2014013021 (MATSUMOTO YUKOH [JP], et al) [A] 5-10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0 91] *; | [I]US2017054752 (NGUYEN DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 23] - [0026]; figures 2, 4 *; | [XI] - NOJIRI T ET AL, "Domain Partitioning Technology for Embedded Multicore Processors", IEEE MICRO, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20091101), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0272-1732, pages 7 - 17, XP011299124 [X] 1,2,11,12,14 * page 8 - page 9; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-9,12,13,15 | [I] - EMILIANO BETTI ET AL, "Hard Real-Time Performances in Multiprocessor-Embedded Systems Using ASMP-Linux", EURASIP JOURNAL ON EMBEDDED SYSTEMS, (20080101), vol. 2008, doi:10.1155/2008/582648, ISSN 1687-3955, pages 1 - 16, XP055017567 [I] 1-15 * Sections 1, 4.3, 4.5, 5.1;; figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2008/582648 | [A] - John Davis Ii ET AL, "Overview of the Ptolemy Project", Technical Memorandum UCB/ERL M01/11, Berkeley, California 94720, (20010306), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://ptolemy.eecs.berkeley.edu/publications/papers/01/overview/overview.pdf, (20140401), XP055111194 [A] 5-10 * pages 4, 7, 11; figure 1 * |