Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3252981
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.03.2024 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.03.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.03.2024 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
12.03.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.07.2020 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.09.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
28.09.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
26.09.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.03.2018 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
22.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
03.11.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
13.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|