Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
08.07.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.10.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
23.05.2017 | Change - representative |