EP3236003 - WELL TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, Texas 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vick, James D. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 02 /
Williamson, Jimmie R. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | 03 /
Scott, Bruce E. 2601 Beltline Road Carrollton, TX 75006 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 17171262.3 | 11.11.2011 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | US20100951502 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: US 951502 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236003 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3236003 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3236003 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/06 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
E21B34/066 (EP,US);
E21B2200/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG | [2023/46] | English: | WELL TOOL | [2017/43] | French: | OUTIL DE PUITS | [2023/46] |
Former [2017/43] | EXZENTRISCHES SICHERHEITSVENTIL | ||
Former [2017/43] | SOUPAPE DE SÉCURITÉ EXCENTRIQUE | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 13.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11842525.5 / EP2643548 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008157014 (VICK JR JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2009293238 (DAVIS MITCHELL G [US]) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0025] , [0085]; figures 10A,10B * | by applicant | US7644767 |