EP3245959 - ADAPTER ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A REMOVABLE TROCAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Stephen 167 Greenwood Street East Hartford, Connecticut 06118 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Justin 208 Lantern Park Lane North Southbury, Connecticut 06488 / US | 03 /
VALENTINE, David 208 West High Street East Hampton, Connecticut 06424 / US | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 17171265.6 | 16.05.2017 | [2017/47] | Priority number, date | US201615157136 | 17.05.2016 Original published format: US201615157136 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3245959 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3245959 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3245959 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/34 (CN,US);
A61B17/07207 (US);
A61B17/3421 (CN);
A61B2017/00367 (CN);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00486 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ADAPTERANORDNUNG MIT EINER ENTFERNBAREN TROKARANORDNUNG | [2017/47] | English: | ADAPTER ASSEMBLY INCLUDING A REMOVABLE TROCAR ASSEMBLY | [2017/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE ADAPTATEUR COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE DE TROCART AMOVIBLE | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | LU | 16.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005037084 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * page 19; figures 7,2 *; | [X]US2014166717 (SWAYZE JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5* paragraph [0063]; figures 4a,4b *; | [X]EP2873380 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * | by applicant | US9023014 | US9055943 |