EP3235394 - CUSHIONING ELEMENT FOR APPAREL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE CUSHIONING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, David Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17171471.0 | 24.02.2012 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | US201113035570 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: US201113035570 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235394 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A41D31/00, B32B3/22, B32B5/24, B32B38/04, B32B38/10, B32B38/18, // A41D13/015, A41D13/05, A41D19/00, A41D31/02, A42B3/06, A43B13/18, A43B13/40, A43D8/06, A43D8/08, A45F3/04, A45F3/08, A45F3/12, A47C7/02, A47C7/18, A47C27/05, A63B71/08, A63B71/12, B26D7/18, B26F1/44, B29C65/18 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B32B38/04 (EP,US);
A41D13/0156 (EP,US);
A41D13/0581 (EP,US);
A41D31/285 (EP,US);
A43B13/187 (EP,US);
A43D8/06 (EP,US);
A43D8/08 (EP,US);
A45F3/08 (EP,US);
A45F3/12 (EP,US);
A47C7/021 (EP,US);
A63B71/08 (EP,US);
A63B71/12 (EP,US);
B26D7/1836 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/133 (EP,US);
B29C66/433 (EP,US);
B29C66/472 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/81457 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/845 (EP,US);
B29C69/005 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B68G13/04 (EP,US);
B68G5/02 (EP,US);
B68G7/00 (EP,US);
A41D13/05 (EP,US);
A45F2003/122 (EP,US);
A45F2003/125 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1233 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1241 (EP,US);
A63B2071/125 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1266 (EP,US);
B29C65/26 (EP,US);
B29C65/30 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (EP,US);
B29C65/62 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/24223 (EP,US);
B29C66/24241 (EP,US);
B29C66/24244 (EP,US);
B29C66/24249 (EP,US);
B29C66/30326 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/729 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/7484 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/836 (EP,US);
B29L2031/443 (EP,US);
B29L2031/48 (EP,US);
B29L2031/4821 (EP,US);
B29L2031/4864 (EP,US);
B29L2031/507 (EP,US);
B29L2031/71 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7128 (EP,US);
B32B2038/042 (EP,US);
B32B2571/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1089 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1093 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/083 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2821/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2883/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2905/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | POLSTERUNGSELEMENT FÜR BEKLEIDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES POLSTERUNGSELEMENTS | [2017/43] | English: | CUSHIONING ELEMENT FOR APPAREL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE CUSHIONING ELEMENT | [2017/43] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MATELASSAGE POUR VÊTEMENTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE MATELASSAGE | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12716755.9 / EP2678150 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3647505 (BJORN-LARSEN KNUT L) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 3 *; | [Y]WO2009035888 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * figures 1-4,7-9 * * pages 10-11 *; | [A]US2010129573 (KIM DANIEL [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-71 * * claims 1-33 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *; | [XY]WO2010104868 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD, et al) [X] 5-9 * abstract * * claims 1-20 * * figures 6-13 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0039] , [0 47] - [0050] * [Y] 1,4; | [AP]WO2011126855 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD, et al) [AP] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 6-12 *; | [P]US2011247744 (TURNER DAVID [US]) [P] * abstract ** figures 6-12 * |