EP3257548 - FACE SOAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taylor, John Richard 2702 East 5th Street, PMB 336 Tyler, TX 75701 / US | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/49] | For all designated states Taylor, John Richard 2702 East 5th Street, PMP 336 Tyler, TX 75701 / US | ||
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Taylor, John Richard P.O.Box 130535 Tyler, TX 75713 / US | ||
Former [2017/51] | For all designated states Taylor, John Richard P.O.Box 130535 Tyler, TX 75713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2017/51] | Abraham, Richard, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17171599.8 | 17.05.2017 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | US201662351830P | 17.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662351830 P | US201715581919 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US201715581919 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3257548 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3257548 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M35/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A61H35/008 (EP,KR,US);
A61H33/02 (CN,KR);
A61F7/00 (CN);
A61H33/028 (KR);
A61H33/6005 (EP,KR);
A61N5/0616 (KR);
A61F2007/0003 (CN);
A61H2033/0004 (CN);
A61H2033/047 (EP);
A61H2033/048 (EP,KR);
A61H2033/143 (EP);
A61H2201/0111 (KR);
A61H2201/10 (EP,CN);
A61H2201/107 (EP);
A61H2205/022 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESICHTSEINWEICHVORRICHTUNG | [2017/51] | English: | FACE SOAKING DEVICE | [2017/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TREMPAGE DE VISAGE | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | GR | 03.11.2023 | |
IS | 02.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6328031 (TISCHER MICHAEL SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US7448093 (RUECK KLAUS-MICHAEL [DE]); | [A]EP2868218 (SI TECH AB [SE]); | [Y]US2016096042 (TAYLOR JOHN RICHARD [US]) | by applicant | WO2015US54576 |