EP3403812 - REPAIR STRIP AND PROCESS FOR WIND TURBINE LEADING EDGE PROTECTION TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoeppel, Wolfgang Martin-Buber-Str. 16 41470 Neuss / DE | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Müller, Bruno 3M Deutschland GmbH 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Straße 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [2019/47] |
Former [2018/47] | Bergen, Katja, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH OIPC Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 17171722.6 | 18.05.2017 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403812 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3403812 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C73/10, // B64F5/40, F03D80/50 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
B29C73/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2018/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REPARATURBAND UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN WINDTURBINENEINTRITTSKANTENSCHUTZBAND | [2018/47] | English: | REPAIR STRIP AND PROCESS FOR WIND TURBINE LEADING EDGE PROTECTION TAPE | [2018/47] | French: | BANDE DE RÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE BANDE DE PROTECTION DE BORD D'ATTAQUE D'ÉOLIENNE | [2018/47] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 16.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2017 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 18.05.2020 | LU | 18.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.05.2017 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005112968 (PANSE DATTATREYA R [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] ** figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2011158807 (HONG SHEK C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] * * figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]US2013012086 (JONES DANIEL THOMAS [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 1-4 * |