EP3235853 - USE OF A COMPOSITION INCLUDING A POLYMER AS ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 7-1 Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Mamoru c/o NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi Toyama, 939-2753 / JP | 02 /
Ohashi, Takuya c/o NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi Toyama, 939-2753 / JP | 03 /
Kishioka, Takahiro c/o NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi Toyama, 939-2753 / JP | 04 /
Enomoto, Tomoyuki c/o NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi Toyama, 939-2753 / JP | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 17172415.6 | 06.09.2012 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | JP20110196318 | 08.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011196318 | JP20110196319 | 08.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011196319 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235853 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/06, C08G59/50, C08L79/04, C09D5/25, C09D11/10, C09D179/04, C09J179/04, H01L21/312, H01L21/52, C08F299/02 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
C09J179/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/3236 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/06 (EP,US);
C08G73/0633 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/0638 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/0677 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/07 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/10 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (EP,KR,US);
C09J11/06 (KR,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/09 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/094 (KR,US);
G03F7/11 (KR,US);
H01L21/02118 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM POLYMER ALS KLEBSTOFF | [2017/43] | English: | USE OF A COMPOSITION INCLUDING A POLYMER AS ADHESIVE | [2017/43] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN POLYMÈRE COMME ADHÉSIF | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12830006.8 / EP2754681 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008003524 (KISHIOKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * formulas (22)-(24); page 8 * * synthesis example 1; page 13 * * page 15; claim 1 * * page 11, paragraph [0113] * [Y] 1-5; | [X]US2008038678 (KISHIOKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * synthetic example 17, formula 41; page 15 *; | [XD]JP2008143954 (JSR CORP) [XD] 1,5 * formula (1), (3), (4); page 2; claims 1,4,6 * * page 6, paragraph [0023] * * page 7, paragraph [0027] * * page 5, paragraph [0021] * * page 3; claims 11-12 * * page 8, paragraph [0032] *; | [X]JP2009093162 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * formula (b-22) to (b-33); formula (c-1); page 16 * * synthesis example 4; page 23 * * page 2; claim 1 * * page 6, paragraph [0014] *; | [Y]US2010266951 (HIROI YOSHIOMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0001] ** formula 24 and 29; page 5 - page 6 * | by applicant | JP2008143954 | WO2008146847 |