EP3407330 - CONTROL SYSTEM AT AN AIRPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 213 76 Malmö / SE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Håkansson, Ola Vårgatan 7 234 31 Lomma / SE | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17172453.7 | 23.05.2017 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407330 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G08G5/04, G08G5/06 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
G08G5/065 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/06 (KR);
G01S13/91 (US);
G08G5/00 (RU);
G08G5/0013 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTROLLSYSTEM AN EINEM FLUGHAFEN | [2018/48] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM AT AN AIRPORT | [2018/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DANS UN AÉROPORT | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 03.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/50] | 10.08.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/50] | Appeal following examination | 20.01.2020 | Appeal received No. T0885/20 | 27.03.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.08.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.08.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005198750 (SPENCER DERWIN C [CA], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0001] - [0005] *; | [I]US2008109970 (HUTTON NEIL [CA]) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] *; | [XI]EP3079136 (SAFEGATE INT AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0078] * [I] 3,10 |