EP3273374 - METHOD FOR ANALYSING IMAGE DATA OF A PATIENT, SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A METHOD FOR ANALYSING IMAGE DATA OF A PATIENT AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Sebastian Am Holzacker 23 91085 Weisendorf / DE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Siemens Healthcare GmbH SHS TE IP Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17172462.8 | 23.05.2017 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273374 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273374 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/40, G06T7/00, G06F16/583, G16H50/20, G06F9/455, // G16H10/60, G16H40/40, G06F8/76 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06F2009/4557 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | G16H30/40, G06T7/00, G06F16/583, G16H50/20, // G16H10/60, G16H40/40, G06F8/76 | ||
Former IPC [2018/04] | G06F19/00, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON BILDDATEN EINES PATIENTEN, SYSTEM ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINES VERFAHRENS ZUR ANALYSE VON BILDDATEN EINES PATIENTEN UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2018/04] | English: | METHOD FOR ANALYSING IMAGE DATA OF A PATIENT, SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A METHOD FOR ANALYSING IMAGE DATA OF A PATIENT AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE D'UN PATIENT, SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À EFFECTUER UN PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE D'UN PATIENT ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2022 | 22.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | IT | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | MC | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | IE | 23.05.2023 | LU | 23.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
IE | 23.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
IE | 23.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
LU | 23.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2006098855 (GKANATSIOS NIKOLAOS A [US], et al) [Y] 8 * page 1, paragraph 0002 - page 5, paragraph 0039 * * claims 1-7 * * figures 1-7 *[A] 1-7,9-11; | [IY]US2016093045 (KOYASU TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 0002 - page 2, paragraph 0026 * * page 2, paragraph 0034 - page 4, paragraph 0062 * * claims 1,5,8 * * figure 1 * [Y] 8; | [A] - Anonymous, "Virtual machine - Wikipedia", (20170521), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170521080317/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Virtual_machine, (20171108), XP055423050 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Laufzeitumgebung - Wikipedia", (20161120), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20161120161026/https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Laufzeitumgebung, (20171108), XP055423051 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2016180052 | US9384413 |