EP3231344 - SUCTION BODY FOR AN UPRIGHT CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Min Ro No. 305, Jooeun-Deco vill, Woosan-dong Gwangsan-gu, Gwangju-si / KR | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 17172811.6 | 04.07.2012 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | KR20110066535 | 05.07.2011 Original published format: KR 20110066535 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231344 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3231344 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
A47L9/0477 (EP,US);
A47L5/30 (KR);
A47L9/04 (KR);
A47L9/0483 (EP,US);
A47L9/1683 (US);
A47L9/20 (US);
A47L9/1666 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SAUGKÖRPER FÜR AUFRECHTEN REINIGER | [2017/42] | English: | SUCTION BODY FOR AN UPRIGHT CLEANER | [2017/42] | French: | CORPS D'ASPIRATION POUR UN ASPIRATEUR VERTICAL | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 09.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12174930.3 / EP2543301 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2012 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | IE | 04.07.2020 | LU | 04.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.07.2012 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
IE | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05103740 (AKAI ELECTRIC) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2003204923 (NAKAMURA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1* figure 7 *; | [A]US2009229075 (ERIKSSON HENRIK [SE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0055] - [0058] *; | [A]GB2469729 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-8 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | JPS513740 | US2009229075 | GB2469729 |