EP3255172 - THERMALLY DISSIPATIVE ARTICLE AND METHOD OF FORMING A THERMALLY DISSIPATIVE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2021/20] |
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Yan 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
KOTTILINGAM, Srikanth Chandrudu 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 03 /
DUTTA, Sandip 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 04 /
TOLLISON, Brian Lee 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2017/50] | Pöpper, Evamaria General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17172859.5 | 24.05.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | US201615167201 | 27.05.2016 Original published format: US201615167201 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255172 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3255172 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/06, C23C4/12, C23C4/18, C23C28/00, C23C4/073, F01D5/28, B22F3/11, B22F7/08, B22F5/00, B23K1/00, B22F5/04, B22F3/24 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B22F3/1121 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (US);
B22F3/1134 (EP,US);
B22F5/009 (EP,US);
B22F5/04 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/36 (EP,US);
C23C4/06 (EP,US);
C23C4/073 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (EP,US);
C23C4/129 (US);
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
B22F2003/242 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1121, B22F2003/242 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1134, B22F2003/242 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | THERMISCH DISSIPATIVER ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES THERMISCH DISSIPATIVEN ARTIKELS | [2017/50] | English: | THERMALLY DISSIPATIVE ARTICLE AND METHOD OF FORMING A THERMALLY DISSIPATIVE ARTICLE | [2017/50] | French: | ARTICLE DE DISSIPATION THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN ARTICLE DE DISSIPATION THERMIQUE | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2017 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | ES | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | MT | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | TR | 19.05.2021 | IE | 24.05.2021 | LU | 24.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | GB | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
TR | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 24.05.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6024787 (LEE YUH-WEN [TW]) [Y] 8,13* column 3, lines 34-45 *; | [XYI]EP1496140 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0019] - [0040] * * figure 1 * [Y] 7-15 [I] 2,3; | [X]US2015111060 (KOTTILINGAM SRIKANTH CHANDRUDU [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]CN104561881 (AVIC BEIJING AERONAUTICAL MFG TECHNOLOGY RES INST) [Y] 7-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046] *; | [Y]EP2881489 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 7-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] * | Examination | US2012099973 |