EP3249252 - BEARING LUBRICATOR, CONTROLLER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGAL BELOIT AMERICA, INC. 200 State Street Beloit, WI 53511 / US | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSARD, Bradford Kyle Regal Beloit America, Inc. 200 State Street Beloit, Wisconsin 53511 / US | 02 /
FISTROVICH, Thomas John Regal Beloit America, Inc. 200 State Street Beloit, Wisconsin 53511 / US | 03 /
LEWIS, Matthew Ivan Regal Beloit America, Inc. 200 State Street Beloit, Wisconsin 53511 / US | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17173015.3 | 26.05.2017 | [2017/48] | Priority number, date | US201615165321 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: US201615165321 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249252 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/66, B65G45/08, F16H57/04 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
F16H57/0464 (EP,US);
F16N29/02 (US);
F16C33/6659 (US);
F16C1/02 (EP,US);
F16C2233/00 (EP,US);
F16C2326/58 (EP,US);
F16C33/6625 (EP,US);
F16N2210/14 (US);
F16N2270/20 (US);
F16N2270/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2017/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERSCHMIERVORRICHTUNG, STEUERGERÄT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2017/48] | English: | BEARING LUBRICATOR, CONTROLLER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2017/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LUBRIFICATION DE PALIER, ORGANE DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6561316 (GRAF WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,17,18,20 * figure 1 * [I] 6,13-16,19; | [XI]WO2010077282 (SKF USA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,17,20 * figures 1-3 * [I] 5,6,14-16,18,19; | [A]WO2011025430 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 2-3 *; | [A]DE102013209889 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 7* paragraph [0015] * |