EP3258172 - HEAT SOURCE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454-0802 / JP | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJIRO, Takashi c/o Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, Aichi 4540802 / JP | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 17173074.0 | 26.05.2017 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | JP20160110792 | 02.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016110792 | JP20160121533 | 20.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016121533 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258172 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258172 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/12, F24H1/30, F24H1/34, F24H1/40, F24H1/44, F24H9/18, F24H9/20 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
F24H1/145 (EP,US);
F24H1/44 (EP,CN,US);
F23N5/12 (EP,US);
F24H1/06 (EP,US);
F24H1/30 (EP,US);
F24H1/34 (EP,US);
F24H1/403 (EP,US);
F24H9/02 (EP,US);
F24H9/1832 (EP,CN,US);
F24H9/2035 (EP,CN,US);
F23D2207/00 (EP,US);
F23N2241/04 (EP,US);
F23N2900/05005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEIZVORRICHTUNG | [2019/41] | English: | HEAT SOURCE APPARATUS | [2017/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFE | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/51] | WÄRMEQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/51] | APPAREIL DE SOURCE THERMIQUE | Examination procedure | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2017 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 26.05.2020 | LU | 26.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.05.2017 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0330056U (NORITSU CORPORATION) [AD] 1 * page 2, line 3 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2011033244 (PALOMA KOGYO KK) [A] 1* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP2420756 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-10 *; | [AD]EP2811141 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JPH0330056 | EP2811141 |