EP3264605 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE-ALIGNED 2X FREQUENCY CLOCK GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive - M/S 1405 San Jose, California CA 95134-1941 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KE, Yanjing Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Pistorius, Richard 2pi Patent Consulting GbR Freiburger Straße 11 79189 Bad Krozingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17173305.8 | 29.05.2017 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | US201615195745 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: US201615195745 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264605 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/173, H03K19/177, H03M9/00 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H03K5/15066 (EP,US);
H03K19/1737 (EP,US);
H03K19/17744 (EP,US);
H03K19/20 (EP,US);
H03K5/1565 (EP,US);
H03M9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PHASENAUSGERICHTETEM 2X-FREQUENZTAKT | [2018/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE-ALIGNED 2X FREQUENCY CLOCK GENERATION | [2018/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'HORLOGE DE FRÉQUENCE 2X À ALIGNEMENT DE PHASE | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5726651 (BELOT DIDIER [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 13; | [XA]US5757807 (TEZUKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 8 * * column 2, line 33 - line 58 * [A] 13; | [XAY]US2003194018 (CHANG CHI [TW]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0026] , [0029] * [A] 13-15 [Y] 3-6; | [YA]EP1753142 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0033]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US2009259781 (PADAPARAMBIL MURALIKUMAR A [US]) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract ** paragraph [0001] *; | [XAI]US2013121383 (SADOWSKI GREG [US]) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0070] - [0073] - [0079] , [0081]; figures 10a,10b,11,13 * [A] 7 [I] 1,2,15 |