EP3275790 - FILLING DEVICE WITH IMPROVED HOSE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baeuerle, Johannes Stegwiesenstr. 79 74423 Obersontheim / DE | 02 /
Kauder, Florian Finkenweg 26 91611 Lehrberg / DE | 03 /
Bratz, Michael Alexander-Von-Humboldt Strasse 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 17173369.4 | 30.05.2017 | [2018/05] | Priority number, date | DE201610213847 | 28.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016213847 | [2018/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3275790 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3275790 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/00, B65B3/30, F04B43/12, A61M1/10 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP);
B65B3/12 (CN);
B65B3/30 (EP);
F04B13/00 (EP);
F04B43/08 (EP,CN);
F04B43/086 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTER SCHLAUCHPUMPE | [2018/05] | English: | FILLING DEVICE WITH IMPROVED HOSE PUMP | [2018/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMPLISSAGE COMPRENANT UNE POMPE À TUYAU AMÉLIORÉE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102010031793 (HEEKE GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]DE19824960 (FUELLTEC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 19 - line 60; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | DE102008001204 | DE102012022836 |