EP3261088 - AUDIO DECODER, AUDIO ENCODER, METHODS FOR DECODING AND ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUENDORF, Max Kulmbacher Str. 5A 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
LECOMTE, Jérémie 1500 Vista Club Circle Apt. 55-302 Santa Clara, 95054 / US | 03 /
MULTRUS, Markus Etzlaubweg 7 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
BAYER, Stefan Dortmunder Str. 14 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
NAGEL, Frederik Welserstr. 22 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | 06 /
FUCHS, Guillaume Joseph-Otto-Kolb-Str. 31 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | 07 /
ROBILLIARD, Julien Großreuther Str. 195 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 08 /
RETTELBACH, Nikolaus Spessartstr. 38 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 09 /
GEIGER, Ralf Jakob-Herz-Weg 36 91052 Erlangen / DE | 10 /
GRILL, Bernhard Obere Bergstraße 14 90607 Rückersdorf / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 17174051.7 | 28.01.2010 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | US20090147895P | 28.01.2009 Original published format: US 147895 P | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261088 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/022, G10L19/20 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G10L19/022 (EP,US);
G10L19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2017/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUDIODECODIERER, AUDIOCODIERER, VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG UND CODIERUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2017/52] | English: | AUDIO DECODER, AUDIO ENCODER, METHODS FOR DECODING AND ENCODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2017/52] | French: | DÉCODEUR AUDIO, ENCODEUR AUDIO, PROCÉDÉS DE DÉCODAGE ET DE CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10152001.3 / EP2214164 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2144171 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,7-10 * figures 13A, 13B, 14A, 14F, 19 *; | [E]EP2491556 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [E] 1,7-10 * page 24, line 36 - page 26, line 32 * * figures 6,7 *; | [XP] - MAX NEUENDORF ET AL, "Proposed Corrections to WD and Reference Software on Unified Speech and Audio Coding", 87. MPEG MEETING; 2-2-2009 - 6-2-2009; LAUSANNE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20090129), no. M16153, XP030044750 [XP] 1-10 * page 4 - page 12 * * tables 5.11, 5.12 * | [XP] - ANONYMOUS, "WD2 of USAC", 87. MPEG MEETING;2-2-2009 - 6-2-2009; LAUSANNE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20090305), no. N10418; N10418, ISSN 0000-0037, XP030016906 [XP] 1-10 * page 42; table 5.11 * * page 64; table 6.2 * * page 67 - page 71 * | [XP] - FUCHS GUILLAUME ET AL, "MDCT-based coder for highly adaptive speech and audio coding", 2009 17TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, IEEE, ISBN 978-1-61738-876-7, (20090824), pages 1264 - 1268, (20150401), XP032759106 [XP] 1,7-10 * section 3.2 * * figure 3 * | [XP] - LECOMTE J PRG A(C)R PRG A(C)MIE ET AL, "Efficient Cross-Fade Windows for Transitions between LPC-Based and Non-LPC Based Audio Coding", AES CONVENTION 126; MAY 2009, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20090501), XP040508994 [XP] 1,7-10 * section 5 * * figure 10 * | [A] - Iso ET AL, "INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR STANDARDISATION ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE DE NORMALISATION ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND AUDIO Contents", (20081018), URL: www, (20140922), XP055141756 [A] 1-10 * page 41; table 5.11 * * page 42; table 5.12 * * sections b) and c) on pages 66 and 67 * |