Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8457975 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2010217607 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69491210 | 27.01.2010 | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3252760 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10152001 | 28.01.2010 | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3252759 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10152001 | 28.01.2010 | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3261088 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10152001 | 28.01.2010 | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2214164T | 31.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10152001 | 28.01.2010 | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2214164 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | B1 | EP2214164 | 26.01.2011 | A3 | EP2214164 | 04.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2645037T | 01.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1247430 | 21.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1247431 | 21.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1248909 | 19.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2214164T | 14.11.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US14789509 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2214164 |