EP3238751 - RESORBABLE BIOCERAMIC COMPOSITIONS OF POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE AND COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tepha, Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue East Wing Suite 360 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Andrew J 61 West Acton Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | 02 /
RIZK, Said 72 Heritage Hill Road Windham, NH 03087 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, David P 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2020/28] |
Former [2017/44] | 01 /
CARTER, Andrew J 61 West Acton Road Stow, MA Massachusetts 01775 / US | ||
02 /
RIZK, Said 72 Heritage Hill Road Windham, NH New Hampshire 03087 / US | |||
03 /
MARTIN, David P 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, MA Massachusetts 02474 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2017/44] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17174070.7 | 11.03.2013 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | US201261649506P | 21.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261649506 P | US201261713139P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713139 P | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238751 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3238751 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/44, A61L27/46, A61L27/58, A61L31/12, A61L31/14, C08L67/04 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/446 (EP,US);
A61L27/46 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L31/127 (EP,US);
A61L31/128 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | RESORBIERBARE BIOKERAMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRAT UND COPOLYMEREN | [2017/44] | English: | RESORBABLE BIOCERAMIC COMPOSITIONS OF POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE AND COPOLYMERS | [2017/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BIOCÉRAMIQUE RÉSORBABLE DE POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE ET LEURS COPOLYMÈRES | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13714066.1 / EP2852417 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2013 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | IE | 11.03.2021 | LU | 11.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0570696 ; | JPH0570696 [ ] (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [XY]EP0714666 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, lines 9-23, 26 * * page 5, lines 39-42,35 - page 6, line 21 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US5697980 (OTANI SUGIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 12-15 * * column 3, lines 36-49 * * column 4, lines 10-13, 35-38 * * claims 1, 2 *; | [XY]WO0018443 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 3-9 * * page 4, lines 16-26 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, lines 16, 23-25, 29 * * page 8, lines 1-4 * * page 9, lines 20-24 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY]WO0056376 (METABOLIX INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,4,30-32, 34 * * page 11, lines 6-20 * * page 18, lines 29-33 * * page 19, line 14 - page 34, line 25 * * page 41, lines 11-13 * * page 42, line 9 - page 43, line 26 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY]US6610764 (MARTIN DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, lines 6-29 * * column 5, lines 16-22 * * column 12, paragraph 3 * * column 13, paragraph 3 * * column 14, paragraphs 2,3 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO2006015316 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * claims 1, 3 *; | [XY]WO2007092417 (TEPHA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 9 - page 4, line 1 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * examples 1,3,4, * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO2007140325 (UNIV NEBRASKA OFFICE OF TECHNO [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 57] , [0 58] , [0 63] , [0 66] , [0 68]; claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 *; | [XY]WO2008070428 (TEPHA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, line 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 9, lines 3,4 * * page 10, lines 24-32 * * page 13, lines 6-14 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO2008095083 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 5 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * claims 1, 3 *; | [XY]WO2009085823 (TEPHA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 4 * * page 5, lines 7-10 * * page 6, lines 21-24 * * page 9, lines 20-22 * * page 11, lines 8-20 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO2010129882 (TORNIER INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 26]; claim 9 *; | [XPY]US2012290073 (WANG YUNBING [US]) [XP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0019] , [0025] , [0039] , [0040] , [0044] , [0045] , [0046] , [0047] , [0049] , [0 53] - [0056] - [0 57] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0074] - [0 76] - [0077] - [000 ] , [0 89] , [0 94] - [0098] - [ 114] - [0118] - [ 124] * [Y] 1-10; | [XY] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2001), Database accession no. 134:163983, URL: STN-International, XP002773597 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * index terms IT: RN=28728-97-4, RN=114959-05-6 * [Y] 1-10 | [ ] - P. KANDACHAR ET AL., "Towards design guidelines for injection molded biodegrdable plastic products", ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE - SOCIETY OF PLASTIC ENGINEERS (2000), 58TH, (2000), vol. 3 | [XY] - C.DOYLE ET AL., "In vitro and in vivo evaluation of polyhydroxybutyrate and of polyhydroxybutyrate reinforced with hydroxyapatite", BIOMATERIALS, (199111), vol. 12, pages 841 - 847, XP002698636 [X] 1-10 * page 842, column l, paragraph 5 - column r, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0142-9612(91)90072-I | [XY] - DAVID P. MARTIN ET AL, "Medical applications of poly-4-hydroxybutyrate: a strong flexible absorbable biomaterial", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, NL, (20031101), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1369-703X(03)00040-8, ISSN 1369-703X, pages 97 - 105, XP055337032 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 99, column l, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-703X(03)00040-8 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 17, Database accession no. 1993-137113, XP002698634 & JPH0570696 A 19930323 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, Database accession no. JP-23310691-A, XP002698635 | [Y] - KNOWLES J C ET AL, "Development of a degradable composite for orthopaedic use: in vivo biomechanical and histological evaluation of two bioactive degradable composites based on the polyhydroxybutyrate polymer", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 13, no. 8, doi:10.1016/0142-9612(92)90099-A, ISSN 0142-9612, (1992), pages 491 - 496, (19920101), XP024142678 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0142-9612(92)90099-A | [Y] - "Advances in Biomaterials", P.J.Doherty et al. (Eds.), Biomaterial-Tissue Interfaces, Elsevier Science Publishers, (1992), pages 439 - 446, XP008162921 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - S.K.MISRA ET AL., "Polyhydroxyalkanoate (PHA)/Inorganic Phase Composites for Tissue Engineering Applications", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (200608), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 2249 - 2258, XP002698656 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2250, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2250, column r, paragraph 2 - page 2251, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2256, column r, paragraph 2 - page 2257, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm060317c | by applicant | US5811272 | WO9932536 | WO0056376 | US6245537 | US6316262 | US6323010 | US6548569 | US6555123 | US6585994 | US6610764 | US6623748 | US2003211131 | US6828357 | US6838493 | US6867247 | US6867248 | US6878758 | US7025980 | US7179883 | US7244442 | US7268205 | WO2009085823 | US7943683 | WO2011159784 | - STEINBUCHEL A. ET AL., "Diversity of Bacterial Polyhydroxyalkanoic Acids", FEMS MICROBIAL. LETT., (1995), vol. 128, pages 219 - 228 | - HORI ET AL., POLYMER, (1995), vol. 36, pages 4703 - 4705 | - HOUK ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 2674 - 2678 | - MOORE, T. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 3771 - 3782 | - MOORE ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 3771 - 3782 | - WILLIAMS, S.F. ET AL., POLYESTERS, III, (2002), vol. 4, pages 91 - 127 | - MARTIN, D. ET AL., "Medical Applications of Poly-4-hydroxybutyrate: A Strong Flexible Absorbable", BIOMATERIAL, BIOCHEM. ENG. J., (2003), vol. 16, pages 97 - 105 |