EP3260193 - STORAGE AND MIXING DEVICE FOR BONE CEMENT WITH A PRESSURE PUMP AND METHOD FOR MIXING BONE CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Medical GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 8/13 61273 Wehrheim / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGT, Sebastian Gamstädter Weg 11 99092 Erfurt / DE | 02 /
KLUGE, Thomas Josef-Görres-Str. 14 56179 Vallendar / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Berner Straße 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Berner Strasse 52 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 17174251.3 | 02.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | DE201610110564 | 08.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016110564 | [2017/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260193 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3260193 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00, B01F15/00, B01F15/02, // A61B17/88 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
B01F31/40 (EP,US);
A61B17/8802 (CN);
B01F35/522 (US);
A61B17/8805 (CN);
A61B17/8833 (CN,US);
B01F23/53 (CN,US);
B01F23/565 (CN);
B01F23/57 (US);
B01F27/2122 (US);
B01F27/806 (US);
B01F27/90 (CN);
B01F35/187 (US);
B01F35/3202 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/712 (CN);
B01F35/7131 (EP,US);
B01F35/7174 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/718 (EP,US);
A61B2017/8838 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Title | German: | LAGER- UND MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR KNOCHENZEMENT MIT DRUCKPUMPE, UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMISCHUNG EINES KNOCHENZEMENTS | [2017/52] | English: | STORAGE AND MIXING DEVICE FOR BONE CEMENT WITH A PRESSURE PUMP AND METHOD FOR MIXING BONE CEMENT | [2017/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE ET DE STOCKAGE POUR CIMENT OSSEUX À L'AIDE D'UNE POMPE DE REFOULEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MÉLANGER UN CIMENT OSSEUX | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/52] | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE ET DE STOCKAGE POUR CIMENT OSSEUX À L'AIDE D'UNE POMPE DE REFOULEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MÉLANGER DU CIMENT OSSEUX | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2017 | AL | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | IE | 02.06.2019 | LU | 02.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.06.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.06.2017 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.06.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.06.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.06.2019 | ||
LU | 02.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 02.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0796653 (CHAN KWAN HO [US]) [AD] 1-16 * column 1, line 5 - line 9 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 41 * * column 8, line 6 - line 43 * * figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]WO2012174670 (MEDMIX SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 13 ** figures 7,8 *; | [A]WO2014205063 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 1,2 * |