blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3409837

EP3409837 - AN ARTIFICIAL TURF INFILL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2023
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2023  [2023/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pintat, Benoit
5 Hartweg
68340 Zellenberg / FR
[2018/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2018/49]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[2018/49]
Application number, filing date17174275.202.06.2017
[2018/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3409837
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:E01C13/08, B01J20/16
[2018/49]
CPC:
E01C13/08 (EP,KR,US); B01J20/165 (EP,KR,US); D10B2505/202 (US);
E01C13/02 (US); E01C2013/086 (US); E01C2201/10 (US);
E01C2201/20 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
Former [2018/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KUNSTRASENFÜLLMATERIAL[2018/49]
English:AN ARTIFICIAL TURF INFILL MATERIAL[2018/49]
French:MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE DE GAZON ARTIFICIEL[2018/49]
Examination procedure05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
05.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/23]
31.01.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2023/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.202206   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012258811  (TETRAULT CHRISTOPHER [US], et al);
 [X]US2014179971  (TEKETEL SHEWANGIZAW [NO], et al);
 [XI]US2014193593  (DALUISE DANIEL A [US]);
 [A]KR101610679B  (HA SEUNG HUI [KR]);
 [X]WO2016204492  (DAESUNG MAT CO LTD [KR])
by applicantUS9468905
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.