EP3251492 - PLANT TRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tabibnia, Ramin 11693 San Vicente Boulevard Suite 708 Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | McQueen, Andrew Peter Script IP Limited Suite J, Anchor House School Close, Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | McQueen, Andrew Peter Miltons IP - Europe 5th Floor, Broad Quay House Prince Street Bristol BS1 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17174388.3 | 02.06.2017 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | US201662344920P | 02.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344920 P | US201615230829 | 08.08.2016 Original published format: US201615230829 | US201715472098 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: US201715472098 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251492 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
A01G9/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZENSCHALE | [2017/49] | English: | PLANT TRAY | [2017/49] | French: | BAC À PLANTES | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 19.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011289839 (CRONK ERIK E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0039]; figures 2,7,11 * [Y] 8-15; | [XY]WO2012050529 (LEE ALAN SIAN GHEE [SG], et al) [X] 1,5 * figures 1,4 * [Y] 8-15; | [XY]JPH1175562 (KASEI CO C I) [X] 1 * figure 6 * [Y] 8-15; | [Y]US2015184398 (TABIBNIA RAMIN [US]) [Y] 8-13 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2012291369 (KNIGHT III STEPHEN J [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US8850753 | US7140156 | US2012298331 | US8302356 | US8128312 |