EP3287433 - BISPHENOL A (BPA) FREE EPOXY RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Massachusetts Lowell One University Avenue Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Daniel 5204 Archstone Avenue Tewksbury, MA Massachusetts 01876 / US | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 17174503.7 | 27.04.2012 | [2018/09] | Priority number, date | US201161479633P | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479633 P | US201161501566P | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501566 P | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287433 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/14, C08G59/22, C09D163/00, C09J163/00, C07D303/28 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C07D303/28 (EP,US);
C08G59/24 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (US);
C09D163/00 (EP);
C08K5/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2018/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BISPHENOL-A(BPA-)-FREIE EPOXIDHARZE | [2018/09] | English: | BISPHENOL A (BPA) FREE EPOXY RESINS | [2018/09] | French: | RÉSINES ÉPOXY EXEMPTES DE BISPHÉNOL A (BPA) | [2018/09] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 28.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12776345.6 / EP2702029 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3950451 (SUZUKI HIROSI, et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US7619056 | US3041300 | US3225067 | - Handbook of Composites, CHAPMAN & HALL, (1998), pages 48 - 74 |