Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
03.08.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.07.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.11.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
07.06.2017 | Change - representative |