EP3412234 - INSTRUMENT WITH A MULTI-FLOW INSTRUMENT HEAD FOR ARGON-PLASMA COAGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brodbeck, Achim Ruländerweg 8 72555 Metzingen / DE | 02 /
Herrberg, Charlotte Rotlaubweg 5 72411 Bodelshausen / DE | 03 /
Stäbler, thomas Zweherenbühlstrasse 42 72070 Tübingen / DE | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | ||
Former [2018/50] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17174743.9 | 07.06.2017 | [2018/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412234 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3412234 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/04 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
A61B18/042 (EP,BR,US);
A61B18/00 (CN,RU,US);
H05H1/46 (US);
A61B18/082 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (BR);
A61B2018/00583 (CN);
A61B2018/00589 (US);
A61B2018/00982 (BR);
A61B2018/048 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2018/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT MIT EINEM MEHRSTROMINSTRUMENTENKOPF ZUR ARGON-PLASMA-KOAGULATION | [2018/50] | English: | INSTRUMENT WITH A MULTI-FLOW INSTRUMENT HEAD FOR ARGON-PLASMA COAGULATION | [2018/50] | French: | INSTRUMENT COMPRENANT UNE TÊTE MULTI-INSTRUMENTS ÉLECTRIQUES POUR LA COAGULATION PLASMA D'ARGON | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 02.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | IE | 07.06.2023 | LU | 07.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1090597 (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10-14* paragraph [0020]; figure 6 *; | [X]JP2002301088 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,2,6,12-14 * paragraph [0039]; figure 13 *; | [X]US2004044342 (MACKAY DALE VICTOR [AU]) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-14 * paragraph [0044]; figure 4 *; | [XDI]DE102005021304 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [XD] 1-4,6-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0037] - [0044]; figure 4 * [I] 10; | [X]US2008039834 (MACKAY DALE V [AU]) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-14 * paragraph [0051]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2009121637 (LAROUSSI MOUNIR [US]) [X] 1,6,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0061] - [0063]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2011288547 (MORGAN ROY E [US], et al) [X] 1,11-14 * paragraph [0077]; figure 6B *; | [X]GB2495400 (GYRUS MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,11-14 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 11; figures 3,4 *; | [XI]EP3141203 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0031]; figure 5 * [I] 3,4,9 | by applicant | DE102005021304 |