EP3255207 - RAILROAD SPIKE REMOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focused Technology Solutions, Inc. 428 Sand Shore Road, Units 11-12 Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US | [2022/38] |
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states Focused Technology Solutions, Inc. 100 Enterprise Drive Suite 301 Rockaway NJ 07866 / US | ||
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENJAMIN, Timothy Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 02 /
ALONZO, Kristopher Andre Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 03 /
BARNBY, Trevor Lee-Michael Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 04 /
GANTT, Samuel Horace Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 05 /
HAWKINS, Jonathan Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 06 /
HOOD, Alexander Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 07 /
SCOTT, Daniel Richard Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 08 /
TONSMEIRE, Zachary Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 09 /
WISE, Kyle Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 10 /
ATIQULLAH, Mir Mohamed Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | 11 /
RUHALA, Laura Ann Railserve, Inc. 1691 Phoenix Blvd., Suite 250 Atlanta, GA 30349 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Edson, Russell Gregory Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Edson, Russell Gregory Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17174787.6 | 07.06.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | US201615175900 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: US201615175900 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255207 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3255207 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E01B29/26, B25C11/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
E01B29/26 (EP,US);
B25C11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EISENBAHNNAGELENTFERNER | [2017/50] | English: | RAILROAD SPIKE REMOVER | [2017/50] | French: | ÉLIMINATEUR DE CRAMPON DE RAIL | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 07.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19216949.8 / EP3653790 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2020
22.09.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hofmann, Stefan Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/44] | 02.10.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.02.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.09.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.01.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/09] | Appeal following opposition | 11.11.2022 | Appeal received No. T2442/22 | 11.11.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | LU | 07.06.2020 | CZ | 07.06.2021 | FI | 07.06.2021 | IE | 07.06.2021 | PL | 07.06.2021 | RO | 07.06.2021 | ES | 08.06.2021 | HU | 08.06.2021 | SE | 08.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | NL | 01.07.2021 | GR | 05.01.2022 | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MK | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
ES | 08.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
SE | 08.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 01.07.2021 | ||
GR | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MK | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
SE | 08.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 01.07.2021 | ||
GR | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MK | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
SE | 08.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 01.07.2021 | ||
GR | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/28] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
SE | 08.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 01.07.2021 | ||
GR | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
SE | 08.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
NL | 01.07.2021 | ||
GR | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
HU | 08.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2021 | ||
FI | 07.06.2021 | ||
RO | 07.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 18.12.2019 | |
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 18.12.2019 | |
BG | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB794433 (SKYHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 64-78; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1041203 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [A] 1,2,13 * column 3, paragraph [0012] - column 4, paragraph [0016]; figures 1-6 *; | [XA]US2009236572 (LAUN CRAIG M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, paragraph [0013] - page 2, paragraph [0018]; figures 1-5 * [A] 3,6,7,13-15; | [A]US2016040365 (BURNS RAYMOND [US]) [A] 4-7,14* page 2, paragraph [0047] - page 3, paragraph [0050]; figures 1-8 * | Opposition | US2639887 | EP1041203 | US2009236572 | US8371556 | US2016040365 | - "Walzlager", H. Braun, U. Fischer , H. Holl, K. Schilling, H.-D. Dobler, W. Günter, Dr. Ignatowitz, W. Rohrer, W. Doll, M. Heinzler, T. Rohrer, D. Strecker, Fachkunde Metall 53. überarbeitete Auflage, VERLAG EUROPA-LEHRMITTEL, (19990000), pages 1pp, 2, 390 - 391, XP055771705 | - HEINZ M. HIERSIG, LEXIKON MASCHINENBAU, Dusseldorf, VDI Verlag, (19950000), page 2pp, 706, 707, XP055771709 |