29.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
25.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.06.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.08.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2019 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.01.2019 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
04.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.10.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
19.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
09.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|