Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024254486 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318502670 | 06.11.2023 | US202016893253 | 04.06.2020 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201514814911 | 31.07.2015 | US201816142953 | 26.09.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022403382 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414391392 | 09.10.2014 | US201916514815 | 17.07.2019 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201715457725 | 13.03.2017 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | US202117170648 | 08.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021087558 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016893253 | 04.06.2020 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201514814911 | 31.07.2015 | US201816142953 | 26.09.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020181614 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414391392 | 09.10.2014 | US201916514815 | 17.07.2019 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201715457725 | 13.03.2017 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019218549 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201514814911 | 31.07.2015 | US201816142953 | 26.09.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9631193 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2017 | B2 | US2015111841 | 23.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201314391392 | 10.04.2013 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10400239 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2019 | B2 | US2018037886 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414391392 | 09.10.2014 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201715457725 | 13.03.2017 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10125364 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2016115476 | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201514814911 | 31.07.2015 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220106851 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207021475 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102423326B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2022 | B1 | KR20200090987 | 29.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | KR20147031349 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102139451B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2020 | B1 | KR20150013159 | 04.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024012395 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018195907 | 17.10.2018 | JP2021180915 | 05.11.2021 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7377246B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2023 | B2 | JP2022036945 | 08.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018195907 | 17.10.2018 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7417352B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2024 | B2 | JP2019022519 | 14.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015505880 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6422854B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2018 | B2 | JP2015518373 | 02.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL293818 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL281295 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | B | IL281295 | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL265410 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | B | IL265410 | 30.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL256958 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3868883 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | EP17175148 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2836595 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | B1 | EP2836595 | 18.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109112131B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2022 | B | CN109112131 | 01.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | CN201380029258 | 10.04.2013 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104540948B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2018 | B | CN104540948 | 22.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2024200975 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2013245949 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | AU2024200975 | 15.02.2024 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | AU2018203098 | 03.05.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | AU2020202970 | 05.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020202970B | Global Dossier | 23.11.2023 | B2 | AU2020202970 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2013245949 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | AU2018203098 | 03.05.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | AU2020202970 | 05.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018203098B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2020 | B2 | AU2018203098 | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2013245949 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | AU2018203098 | 03.05.2018 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013245949 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3284824 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014025020 | 11.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2868290 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3169218 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2868290 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119491T | 07.03.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2836595T | 18.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2640260T | 02.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1201876 | 11.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20171369T | 29.12.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2836595T | 25.09.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME02850 | 20.04.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX368723 | 14.10.2019 | B | MX2014012215 | 07.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2836595T | 29.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS56428 | 31.01.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2687223 | 07.05.2019 | C2 | RU2014144630 | 27.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2836595T | 31.01.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13721433 | 10.04.2013 | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201408111 | 25.01.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US36006 | 10.04.2013 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013155204 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2014 | A3 | WO2013155204 | 17.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9133461 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2015 | B2 | US2013281511 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR090641 | 26.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2014002725 | 26.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2016003041 | 26.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO7121351 | 20.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1251014 | 18.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE034311T | 28.02.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019012252 | 23.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021009118 | 30.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2836595T | 18.09.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2019111696 | 21.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261622288 | 10.04.2012 | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3868883 | Type | Earlier application | EP2836595 |