EP3284824 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING EXPRESSION OF THE ALAS1 GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTENCOURT, Brian c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 02 /
FITZGERALD, Kevin 40 Williams Street Apt. 202 Brookline, MA Massachusetts 02446 / US | 03 /
QUERBES, William c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02142 / US | 04 /
YASUDA, Makiko 100 Overlook Terrace Apartment 612 New York, NY New York 10040 / US | 05 /
DESNICK, Robert J. 170 East 93rd Street New York, NY New York 10128 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 17175148.0 | 10.04.2013 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | US201261622288P | 10.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261622288 P | US201313835613 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313835613 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284824 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/113 (IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/60 (IL,US);
A61K48/00 (IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/20 (EP,IL);
A61P25/22 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P29/02 (EP,IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/1137 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12Y203/01037 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/343 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/344 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/3515 (KR);
C12N2310/3521 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3533 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (US,EP);
C12N2310/344, C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | 10.07.2017 | ME | 10.07.2017 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG DER EXPRESSION DES ALAS1-GENS | [2018/08] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING EXPRESSION OF THE ALAS1 GENE | [2018/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'INHIBITION D'EXPRESSION DU GÈNE ALAS1 | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13721433.4 / EP2836595 | Divisional application(s) | EP21155819.2 / EP3868883 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009073809 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2009134487 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010148013 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US564562 | US3687808 | US4426330 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4534899 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | WO8804924 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4837028 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4904582 | WO9004384 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4981957 | WO9105545 | US5013556 | US5023243 | US5032401 | US5034506 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5130130 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5139941 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177195 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5213804 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5225212 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5252479 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264564 | US5264221 | WO9324641 | US5272250 | US5276019 | US5278302 | WO9402595 | US5286717 | US5292873 | EP0445131 | US5317098 | US5319080 | WO9412649 | US5321131 | WO9413788 | WO9420073 | US5356633 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5371241 | EP0496813 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5436146 | US5446137 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5502177 | WO9610391 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541316 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5540935 | US5543152 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5556948 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5585481 | WO9640062 | WO9640964 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | WO9704787 | US5607677 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | WO9730731 | US5663312 | US5665557 | US5665710 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5700920 | US5705188 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5750692 | US5976567 | US5981276 | US5981501 | US6015886 | WO0003683 | US6028188 | WO0022113 | WO0022114 | US6054299 | US6124445 | US6143520 | US6147200 | US6160109 | US6166197 | US6169170 | US6172209 | US6191105 | US6222025 | US6235887 | US6239265 | US6268490 | US6277603 | US6294664 | US6320017 | US6326199 | US6346614 | US6380368 | US6444423 | US2003027780 | US6528640 | US6531590 | US6534639 | US6534484 | US6576752 | US6586410 | US6608035 | US6617438 | US6639062 | US6670461 | US6683167 | US6747014 | US6783931 | US6794499 | US6815432 | US6858715 | US6867294 | US6878805 | US6887906 | US6900297 | US2005226848 | US2005281781 | US6998484 | US7015315 | US7037646 | US7041816 | US7045610 | US7053207 | US7063860 | US7070802 | US7084125 | US2006240093 | US7157099 | USRE39464E | US2007111963 | US2007135372 | US7273933 | US7321029 | WO2008042973 | US7399845 | US7427672 | US7427605 | US7495088 | WO2009082817 | WO2009127060 | WO2011005861 | US8106022 | US20080056230 | US20080107998 | WO2009US63933 | WO2010US22614 | WO2010US33777 | WO2010US38224 |