EP3255590 - SCALABLE ANALYTICS ARCHITECTURE FOR AUTOMATION CONTROL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124-6188 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDLER, Scott N. 16455 Haskins Road Chagrin Falls, OH Ohio 44023 / US | 02 /
DYCK, John 15145 Auburn Rd. Newbury, OH 44065 / US | 03 /
PANTALEANO, Michael John 4273 River Street Willoughby, OH Ohio 44094 / US | 04 /
HILL, Edward Alan 110 Hunting Trail Chagrin Falls, OH Ohio 44022 / US | 05 /
CAHALANE, Ryan 11315 Saybrook Ln Chagrin Falls, OH Ohio 44023 / US | 06 /
BURNHAM, Nancy Lynne 110 Hunting Trl Chagrin Falls, OH Ohio 44022 / US | 07 /
PTACEK, Petr 112 Renaissance Court Chagrin Falls, OH Ohio 44023-5430 / US | 08 /
LIBERMAN, Eugene M. 22276 River Walk Road Rocky River, OH Ohio 44116 / US | 09 /
COMEAU, David Wayne 18980 White Oak Drive Auburn Township, OH Ohio 44023 / US | 10 /
WISE, Jonathan 11245 Nicoles Way Chardon, OH Ohio 44024 / US | 11 /
KELLER, Michael R. W142 N6541 Florence Avenue Menomonee Falls, WI Wisconsin 53051 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 17175166.2 | 09.06.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | US201662347789P | 09.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662347789 P | US201715609323 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US201715609323 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255590 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G05B19/418 (CN);
G05B19/41835 (US);
G05B2219/31151 (US);
G05B2219/31368 (US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE ANALYSEARCHITEKTUR FÜR AUTOMATISIERUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEME | [2017/50] | English: | SCALABLE ANALYTICS ARCHITECTURE FOR AUTOMATION CONTROL SYSTEMS | [2017/50] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'ANALYSE ÉCHELONNABLE POUR DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE D'AUTOMATISATION | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 16.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2592812 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [0042] - [0051]; figures 1-21 *; | [I]US2013124465 (PINGEL JAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] - [0051] - [0057] , [0061] - [0064]; figures 1-21 *; | [I]EP2801935 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0 27] - [0031]; figures 1-25 *; | [I]US2014335480 (ASENJO JUAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0 79] - [0092]; figures 1-17 *; | [I]US2015281356 (MATURANA FRANCISCO P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0 47] - [0051]; figures 1-20 *; | [I]EP3018596 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0 24] - [0031]; figures 1-22 * |