EP3258558 - CONTACT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR POWER BUS BARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2021 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: SE | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wöhner GmbH & Co. KG Elektrotechnische Systeme Mönchrödener Strasse 10 96472 Rödental / DE | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büttner, Alex Wirthswiese 3 96472 Rödental / DE | 02 /
Steinberger, Philipp Nussleite 1 96472 Rödental / DE | 03 /
Masel, Joram Strauer Torweg 8 96317 Kronach / DE | 04 /
Leistner, Frank Eisfelder Strasse 34b 96465 Neustadt / DE | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17175494.8 | 18.10.2013 | [2017/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258558 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258558 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/14, H02B1/06, // H02B1/20, H02B1/04, H02B1/056 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H02B1/14 (EP,US);
H01R13/512 (CN);
H01R9/2675 (US);
H01R13/629 (CN);
H02B1/044 (US);
H02B1/06 (EP,US);
H02G5/00 (US);
H02G5/04 (US);
H02H7/22 (US);
H02B1/043 (EP,US);
H02B1/0565 (EP,US);
H02B1/20 (EP,US);
Y10S439/949 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/51] | H02B1/044, H02B1/14, H02G5/04, // H02B1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR STROMSAMMELSCHIENEN | [2017/51] | English: | CONTACT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR POWER BUS BARS | [2017/51] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LE CONTACT POUR BARRES OMNIBUS | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13189226.7 / EP2863496 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2013 | AL | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | AT | 18.10.2018 | IE | 18.10.2018 | LU | 18.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | FR | 19.11.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | GB | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2021/19] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.10.2013 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MK | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 18.10.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 18.10.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 18.10.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 18.10.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2360260 (ELGE VERKEN AB) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]EP0753916 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 3; figure - *; | [A]EP1206019 (MUELLER JEAN OHG ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 6-10 *; | [A]ES2306572 (PRONUTEC SA [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2037550 (MUELLER JEAN OHG ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 25] , [0 27]; figure - * |