EP3415768 - A FAN ASSEMBLY WITH ECCENTRIC ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. The Base, Tower B5 unit 107 Evert van de Beekstraat 1 1118 CL Schiphol / NL | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. World Trade Center Schiphol Boulevard 127 1118 BG Schiphol / NL | Representative(s) | Rüber, Bernhard Jakob Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17175765.1 | 13.06.2017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415768 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42, F04D29/66, // F04D29/28 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
F04D29/422 (EP);
F04D29/4226 (EP);
F04D29/663 (EP);
F04D29/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBLÄSEANORDNUNG MIT EXZENTRISCHEM ROTOR | [2018/51] | English: | A FAN ASSEMBLY WITH ECCENTRIC ROTOR | [2018/51] | French: | ENSEMBLE VENTILATEUR À ROTOR EXCENTRIQUE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/18] | 21.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US820399 (DAVIDSON SAMUEL CLELAND [IE]) [X] 1,5,9,13-15 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 4 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,6-8; | [XI]DE3310376 (MULFINGEN ELEKTROBAU EBM [DE]) [X] 1,5,9-11,13 * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 33 * * page 14, line 4 - page 15, line 14 * * figures 1,2,4 * [I] 2-4,6-8,12,14,15; | [XI]JPH05149297 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,5,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *[I] 2-4,6-8,12; | [XI]US2005069410 (LIAO DENNI [TW]) [X] 1,5,6,9-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-4,12,15 |