EP3415874 - A SENSING DEVICE, A SENSING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR SENSING AN EXTERNAL INFLUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSEN, Roelof IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
ROCHUS, Veronique IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
ROTTENBERG, Xavier IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17175938.4 | 14.06.2017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415874 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353, G01L9/00, G01L11/02 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G01D5/35329 (EP);
G01D5/35383 (EP);
G01L9/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG, MESSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES EXTERNEN EINFLUSSES | [2018/51] | English: | A SENSING DEVICE, A SENSING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR SENSING AN EXTERNAL INFLUENCE | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION, SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE INFLUENCE EXTÉRIEURE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 09.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]AT392537B (TABARELLI WERNER [LI]) [X] 1-6,9,10,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 46; figure 1 * * page 6, line 20 - line 54; figure 3 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 11,12,14,15; | [Y]US2006023988 (KURTZ ANTHONY D [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 * | [XYI] - D. STOWE ET AL, "Demodulation of interferometric sensors using a fiber-optic passive quadrature demodulator", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., US, (19830903), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1109/JLT.1983.1072135, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 519 - 523, XP055434910 [X] 1-6,9,10,13 * Sections I - III;; figure 2 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 11,12,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.1983.1072135 | by applicant | JPS61239132 |