EP3343921 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITAL DATA COMPRESSION WITH SIGN BIT REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states intoPIX Rue Emile Francqui 9 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESSY, Valentin Rue des Rabots 113 6220 Fleurus / BE | 02 /
PELLEGRIN, Pascal Hubert Rue de Jausse 246 5100 Wierde / BE | 03 /
DENISON, Thomas Rue des Communes Beuzet 24 5030 Gembloux / BE | 04 /
BUYSSCHAERT, Charles Daniel Square Louisa 30 1150 Bruxelles / BE | 05 /
ROUVROY, Gaël Avenue Louis Ceusters 46 1150 Woluwe-Saint-Pierre / BE | 06 /
CRUCIFIX, Gauthier Rue Fosse-Moray 81 6800 Libramont-Chevigny / BE | 07 /
GILMONT, Tanguy Ruelle Botte 11 1490 Court-Saint-Etienne / BE | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Debled, Thierry Pecher & Partners Rue Louis de Geer, 6 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Pecher, Nicolas, et al Pecher & Partners Rue Louis de Geer, 6 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Application number, filing date | 17176196.8 | 15.06.2017 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | US201615394879 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US201615394879 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343921 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343921 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/132, H04N19/645, H04N19/124, H04N19/146, H04N19/18, H04N19/184 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,US);
H04N19/423 (US);
H04N19/44 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIGITALDATENKOMPRESSION MIT ZEICHENBITENTFERNUNG | [2018/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITAL DATA COMPRESSION WITH SIGN BIT REMOVAL | [2018/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION DE DONNÉES NUMÉRIQUES AVEC ÉLIMINATION DE BITS DE SIGNE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 26.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 26.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2021 | 25.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2017 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | MT | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.06.2017 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
TR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.06.2017 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.06.2017 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.06.2017 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6549666 (SCHWARTZ EDWARD L [US]) [Y] 1-13 * column 21, lines 9-55 *; | [A]WO2010091930 (ZORAN FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 7,8* paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]EP2773122 (INTOPIX S A [BE]) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-9 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] * | Examination | - INTOPIX, "intoPIX Codec Submission for JPEG-XS CfP, Design description V0.1", 73. JPEG MEETING;14-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (JOINT PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG1); URL: HTTPS://WWW.ISO.ORG,, (20160923), no. wg1m73019, XP030190195 | - "Text of ISO/IEC 21122 WD1 (JPEG XS)", 73. JPEG MEETING;14-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (JOINT PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG1),, (20161021), no. wg1n73016, XP030170292 | - FRAUNHOFER IIS ET AL, "JPEG XS low complexity coder proposal", 73. JPEG MEETING;14-10-2016 - 21-10-2016; CHENGDU; (JOINT PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG1); URL: HTTPS://WWW.ISO.ORG,, (20160923), no. wg1m73018, XP030190194 | by applicant | US6778709 | US9332258 |