EP3290546 - IONISED WATER GENERATOR BY ELECTROLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NANOPLUS LTD. The Grand Pavilion Commercial Centre Oleander Way, 802 West Bay Road PO Box 32052 Grand Cayman, KY1-1208 / KY | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Hung-Tu 9F., No.79 Lane 162, Siangyang Rd. Nangang District 115 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Lo, Cheng-Wen 12F.-2, No.246 Lixing Rd. Sanmin Dist. 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
Si, Tak-Ngai Samuel 17F, Apex garden Shatin Park Shatin, NT / HK | 04 /
Tai, Ming-Yan Flat 1, G/F Shun Cheung House Shu Chi Count Kwun Tong Kowloon / HK | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17176395.6 | 16.06.2017 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | TWU 105213352 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/22] |
Former [2018/21] | TW0 | 31.08.2016 | |
Former [2018/18] | TW16113352 | 31.08.2016 | |
Former [2018/10] | TW16213352U | 31.08.2016 | |
Former [2018/18] | TWA 16113352 | 31.08.2016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290546 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/04, // C02F1/461, C25B13/00, C25B9/10, C25B9/08, C25B9/12 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
C02F1/4618 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/46109 (US);
C02F1/46114 (EP,US);
C25B11/02 (EP,US);
C25B15/02 (EP,US);
C25B15/04 (EP,US);
C25B9/19 (EP,US);
C25B9/23 (KR);
C25B9/30 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46123 (EP,US);
C02F2001/4619 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,KR,US);
C02F2201/4612 (US);
C02F2201/4614 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4617 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGER VON IONISIERTEM WASSER DURCH ELEKTROLYSE | [2018/10] | English: | IONISED WATER GENERATOR BY ELECTROLYSIS | [2018/10] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'EAU IONIQUE PAR ÉLECTROLYSE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.2021 | 30.06.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1038838 (YAMAOKA TATEKI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0018] , [0022] - [0025] - [0033] , [0034] , [0038]; figures 1-3,17,18-21; claims 1,5-8,10 * [I] 2-5; | [I]US5599438 (SHIRAMIZU YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * column 11, line 41 - column 12, line 52 * * column 2, lines 19-53 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0612694 (NIPPON INTEK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3,4 * column 4, lines 3-53; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2857360 (TECH CORP CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |