EP3264536 - LOCKING FASTENING DEVICE FOR AXIAL COUPLINGS IN TWO-PART ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol - Air LB 2 rue Clement Ader ZAC de WE BP 42 08110 Carignan / FR | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPUCCI, Matthieu 3 rue de Pierie 08210 Amblimont / FR | 02 /
WANSCHOOR, Anthony 4bis rue Labauche 08200 Sedan / FR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4a rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 17176771.8 | 20.06.2017 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | FR20160056238 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: FR 1656238 | [2018/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264536 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264536 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/645, H01R13/625 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/64 (EP,US);
H01R13/6395 (US);
H01R13/627 (US);
H01R13/6453 (EP,US);
H01R13/508 (US);
H01R13/622 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERRIEGELNDE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AXIALKUPPLUNGEN IN ZWEI-TEIL-ELEKTRISCHEN ANSCHLÜSSEN | [2018/01] | English: | LOCKING FASTENING DEVICE FOR AXIAL COUPLINGS IN TWO-PART ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION À VERROUILLAGE POUR CONNECTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES EN DEUX PARTIES À ACCOUPLAGE AXIAL | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | IE | 20.06.2023 | LU | 20.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 20.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 20.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0416769 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-4 * * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 56 * * column 12, line 34 - column 39 *; | [A]FR2849967 (AMPHENOL AIR LB [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-6 * * page 5, line 16 - page 11, line 29 *; | [A]FR2887079 (AMPHENOL AIR LB SOC PAR ACTION [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2008145516 (COACTIVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9* figures 1-20 *; | [A]EP2571113 (AMPHENOL AIR LB [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] - [ 0029] - [0030] - [ 0032] , [ 0034] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [ 0058] , [ 0063] - [0064] - [ 0066] *; | [X]EP2787579 (AMPHENOL AIR LB [FR]) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0006] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * |