Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3260640 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B1 | EP3260640 | 27.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20164560 | 21.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2737856T | 16.01.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20164560 | 21.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITUA20164560 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20164560 | 21.06.2016 |