EP3270187 - MULTIPLE-OPTICAL-AXIS PHOTOELECTRIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAJI, Takamasa c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Tetsuya c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
TAKIGUCHI, Nobuchika c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
NISHIUCHI, Satoshi c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17177081.1 | 21.06.2017 | [2018/03] | Priority number, date | JP20160138851 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016138851 | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270187 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/20, G01V8/20, // F16P3/14, G01J1/02 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
G01J1/0271 (EP,US);
G01J1/0403 (EP,US);
G01J1/0252 (EP,US);
G01J1/0407 (EP,US);
G01V8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOELEKTRONISCHER SENSOR MIT MEHREREN OPTISCHEN ACHSEN | [2018/03] | English: | MULTIPLE-OPTICAL-AXIS PHOTOELECTRIC SENSOR | [2018/03] | French: | CAPTEUR PHOTO-ÉLECTRIQUE À AXE MULTI-OPTIQUE | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005321198 (KEYENCE CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2,4-10 ** paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0030] - [0039] *; | [XA]US2009001298 (DEGUCHI TOMOKI [JP]) [X] 1,5-8 * figures 1-3,5-7 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0025] - [0034] - [0038] - [0045] - [0047] - [0058] * [A] 2-4; | [XA]EP2461340 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * figures 1-6, 8, 9 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] - [0031] - [0033] - [0036] - [0040] - [0049] * [A] 3,5,6; | [XPA]WO2016157940 (PANASONIC IND DEVICES SUNX CO [JP]) [XP] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * figures 1-4,6-9,11,12 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0021] - [0026] - [0028] - [0036] - [0040] - [0044] - [0047] - [0050] - [0054] * [A] 3,6 | by applicant | JPS5141825B |