|
03.11.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
30.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2017 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Deficiencies in application documents - annex A |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Invitation to file claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |