13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
04.11.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
03.12.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
26.11.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
22.11.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.11.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.11.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
19.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.05.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.03.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
06.11.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.06.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
05.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|