EP3324582 - MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Huran IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Younhwa IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
JANG, Hyungtae IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Yoojin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 05 /
KIM, Sunjae IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 06 /
YOON, Sunghye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 17177200.7 | 21.06.2017 | [2018/21] | Priority number, date | KR20160154337 | 18.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160154337 | KR20160155128 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160155128 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324582 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04N21/488 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
H04L51/046 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L51/10 (US);
H04L51/212 (EP,US);
H04L51/216 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (US);
H04N21/488 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04W52/0209 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2018/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2018/21] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2018/21] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2022 | 04.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/22] | 25.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016039509 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 10,14,15 * See US 2017/289085 *; | [XAI]US2016323333 (AGGARWAL ANURAG [IN], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0108] * * figure 8 * [A] 11 [I] 2-10,12-15; | US2017289085 [ ] (KIM JAEWOON [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0140] ** figure 27 * |