EP3260125 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REGENERATING HAIR BY MEANS OF AUTOLOGOUS STEM CELL MICROGRAFTS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casanova Rosell, Jose Miguel Rambla Geller 91 entl 4 08190 Sant Cugat del Valles Barcelona / ES | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier, et al LLR Lyon 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 17177227.0 | 21.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | ES20160000511 | 21.06.2016 Original published format: ES 201600511 | [2017/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3260125 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3260125 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/36, B02C18/10, B02C18/30, B02C18/36, A61P17/14 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
A61K35/36 (EP,ES);
A61P17/14 (EP);
B02C18/365 (ES);
C12M45/02 (EP);
C12M45/05 (EP);
C12N5/0628 (EP);
G01N2001/2866 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG VON HAAREN DURCH MIKROCHIRURGISCHE HAARTRANSPLANTATION VON AUTOLOGEN STAMMZELLEN, UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2017/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REGENERATING HAIR BY MEANS OF AUTOLOGOUS STEM CELL MICROGRAFTS, AND USE THEREOF | [2017/52] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REGENERATION DE CHEVEUX AU MOYEN DE MICROGREFFES AUTOLOGUES DE CELLULES SOUCHES, ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDP]WO2016097960 (HUMAN BRAIN WAVE S R L [IT]) [XDP] 1 * page 19, line 23 - page 20, line 7 * * figure - * * claim - *; | [I]EP0720513 (CONSUL T S S R L [IT]) [I] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 25 * * figures 1-5 * * claim - * | [I] - Alta-Tech Camlog, "Video RIGENERA. Ricerca e tecnologia per la rigenerazione dei tessuti umani.", (20140411), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=-ixE9bQSemo, (20150903), XP054976045 [I] 1 * the whole document * |