Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3272850
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.07.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.10.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
28.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
28.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |