EP3306570 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Kwon-taek 431-501, 70, Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18456 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Choon-ki 106-1808, 65, Sambong-ro, Manan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 14017 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
KWON, Kwon-taek 431-501, 70, Dongtanbanseok-ro 18456 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
JANG, Choon-ki 106-1808, 65, Sambong-ro, Manan-gu 14017 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 17177555.4 | 23.06.2017 | [2018/15] | Priority number, date | KR20160129870 | 07.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160129870 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306570 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, G06T11/40 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G06T15/005 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/0137 (KR);
G06T15/83 (CN);
G06T15/80 (US);
G06T1/20 (CN,KR,US);
G06T11/40 (EP,US);
G06T15/87 (US);
G06T3/18 (KR);
H04N7/0117 (KR);
G06T2200/28 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BILDDATEN | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING IMAGE DATA | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES | [2018/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 09.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/12] | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008143730 (LINDHOLM JOHN ERIK [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0047] , [0057] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0075] *; | [IA]US2014125687 (SAULTERS SCOTT [TW]) [I] 1,7,16,17 * figures 1-3B * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050] * [A] 2-6,8-15,18-20; | [I]US2015103087 (ROUET CHRISTIAN JEAN [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2016110889 (SHIM HEE JUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0076] *; | [XI]EP3016091 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3-7,9-16 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0099] * * paragraphs [0108] , [0109] * [I] 2,8,17-20; | [A] - ANDREW GARRARD, "Moving pictures", 20140727; 20140810 - 20140814, (20140727), doi:10.1145/2614028.2615452, ISBN 978-1-4503-2962-0, pages 1 - 53, XP058053254 [A] 1-20 * page 13 - page 16 * * page 44 - page 49 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2614028.2615452 |