EP3421301 - REAR SEAT AIRBAG SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation Intellectual Property VAK - HBBVN 40 531 Göteborg / SE | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberg, Mr. Johan Hermanslustvägen 4 44332 Lerum / SE | 02 /
Rutgersson, Sebastian Älvsborgsgatan 23B 41472 Göteborg / SE | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17178005.9 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421301 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/231, B60R21/2338, B60R21/207 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP);
B60R21/2338 (EP);
B60R2021/23153 (EP);
B60R2021/23169 (EP);
B60R2021/23382 (EP);
B60R2021/23386 (EP);
B60R21/207 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKSITZAIRBAGSYSTEM | [2019/01] | English: | REAR SEAT AIRBAG SYSTEM | [2019/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ DE SIÈGE ARRIÈRE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US9308883 (SCHNEIDER DAVID W [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 9, line 26 - column 11, line 35; figures 4a-7a *; | [X]US2016107598 (FISCHER KURT F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1,2,6a-7c *; | [IA]DE19540911 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [I] 1,2,4-14 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 42; figures 4-7 * [A] 3 | by applicant | US2017036565 |