Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
13.08.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.12.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
29.06.2017 | Change - representative |