EP3422005 - DETERMINING ENRICHMENTS OF TRACERS OF GLUCOSE BY MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Universität Graz Auenbruggerplatz 2 8036 Graz / AT | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regittnig, Werner Liebiggasse 14 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Köfeler, Harald Sonnenhang 1 8046 Stattegg / AT | 03 /
Trötzmüller, Martin Edelsgrub 218 8302 Nestelbach / AT | 04 /
Triebl, Alexander Flugplatzstraße 24 7061 Trausdorf / AT | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/01] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17178182.6 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422005 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3422005 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, H01J49/00, G01N30/72 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/66 (EP,US);
G01N30/72 (EP,US);
G01N33/583 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8813 (EP);
G01N2030/8836 (EP,US);
H01J49/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER ANREICHERUNGEN VON TRACERN VON GLUCOSE MITTELS MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | [2019/01] | English: | DETERMINING ENRICHMENTS OF TRACERS OF GLUCOSE BY MASS SPECTROMETRY | [2019/01] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'ENRICHISSEMENTS DE TRACEURS DE GLUCOSE PAR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 28.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 27.06.2020 | LU | 27.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011084751 (QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INVEST INC [US], et al) [Y] 17 * the whole document, in particular the claims *; | [Y]WO2014105858 (QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INVEST INC [US]) [Y] 17 * the whole document, in particular the claims *; | [Y]WO2016141204 (QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INVEST LLC [US]) [Y] 17 * the whole document, in particular the claims *; | [XDY] - G. TOFFOLO ET AL, "Glucose Fluxes During OGTT in Adolescents Assessed by a Stable Isotope Triple Tracer Method", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM., DE, (20080101), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1515/JPEM.2008.21.1.31, ISSN 0334-018X, XP055431422 [XD] 16 * the whole document, in particular the abstract * [Y] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/JPEM.2008.21.1.31 | [XDY] - RITA BASU ET AL, "Use of a novel triple-tracer approach to assess postprandial glucose metabolism", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM., US, (20030101), vol. 284, no. 1, doi:10.1152/ajpendo.00190.2001, ISSN 0193-1849, pages E55 - E69, XP055431434 [XD] 16 * the whole document, in particular the abstract * [Y] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpendo.00190.2001 | [XDY] - A. HAIDAR ET AL, "Validity of triple- and dual-tracer techniques to estimate glucose appearance", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM., US, (20120327), vol. 302, no. 12, doi:10.1152/ajpendo.00581.2011, ISSN 0193-1849, pages E1493 - E1501, XP055431777 [XD] 16 * the whole document, in particular the abstract * [Y] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpendo.00581.2011 | [XY] - ANDREAS BORNØ ET AL, "Glucose and glycerol concentrations and their tracer enrichment measurements using liquid chromatography tandem mass spectrometry : LC-MS/MS measurements of glucose and glycerol", JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY., GB, (20140929), vol. 49, no. 10, doi:10.1002/jms.3407, ISSN 1076-5174, pages 980 - 988, XP055431378 [X] 16 * the whole document, in particular the abstract * [Y] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jms.3407 | [Y] - FREY ALEXANDER J ET AL, "LC-quadrupole/Orbitrap high-resolution mass spectrometry enables stable isotope-resolved simultaneous quantification and13C-isotopic labeling of acyl-coenzyme A thioesters", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 408, no. 13, doi:10.1007/S00216-016-9448-5, ISSN 1618-2642, (20160311), pages 3651 - 3658, (20160311), XP035867745 [Y] 17 * the whole document, in particular the abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-016-9448-5 | [A] - SUN D ET AL, "Quantification of the concentration and ^1^3C tracer enrichment of long-chain fatty acyl-coenzyme A in muscle by liquid chromatography/mass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 349, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2005.10.006, ISSN 0003-2697, (20060201), pages 87 - 95, (20060201), XP024941974 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2005.10.006 | [A] - ALAN G. MARSHALL ET AL, "High-Resolution Mass Spectrometers", ANNUAL REVIEW OF ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20080701), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev.anchem.1.031207.112945, ISSN 1936-1327, pages 579 - 599, XP055431756 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.anchem.1.031207.112945 | [T] - MARTIN TRÖTZMÜLLER ET AL, "Determination of the Isotopic Enrichment of 13 C- and 2 H-Labeled Tracers of Glucose Using High-Resolution Mass Spectrometry: Application to Dual- and Triple-Tracer Studies", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20171121), vol. 89, no. 22, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.7b03134, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 12252 - 12260, XP055431788 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.7b03134 | by applicant | WO2007031717 | WO2007106816 | US2013103337 | - TOFFOLO et al., Journal of Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism, (20080000), vol. 21, pages 31 - 45 | - BASU et al., American Journal of Physiology Endocrinology Metabolism, (20030000), vol. 248, pages E55 - E69 | - HAIDAR et al., American Journal of Physiology Endocrinology Metabolism, (20120000), vol. 302, pages E1493 - E1501 |