EP3422150 - METHODS, APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR ENABLING CONSUMPTION OF VIRTUAL CONTENT FOR MEDIATED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAAKSONEN, Lasse Juhani Näsilinnankatu 23 B 28 33210 Tampere / FI | 02 /
VILERMO, Miikka Selmankuja 5 37200 Tampere / FI | 03 /
TAMMI, Mikko Kohmankaari 1 C 13 33310 Tampere / FI | 04 /
LEHTINIEMI, Arto Lomarantatie 17 33880 Lempäälä / FI | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 17178898.7 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422150 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME, COMPUTERPROGRAMME ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DES KONSUMS VIRTUELLER INHALTE VON ÜBERMITTELTER REALITÄT | [2019/01] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUS, SYSTEMS, COMPUTER PROGRAMS FOR ENABLING CONSUMPTION OF VIRTUAL CONTENT FOR MEDIATED REALITY | [2019/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS, SYSTÈMES, PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES PERMETTANT L'ACCÈS AU CONTENU VIRTUEL DE RÉALITÉ COMMUNIQUÉE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 02.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017026577 (YOU YU [FI], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0023] , [0060] - [0076] - [0082] - [0099] - [0105] - [0116] *[I] 3-15 |