EP3263724 - METALLURGICAL PROCESS AND ARTICLE WITH NICKEL-CHROMIUM SUPERALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Gopal 16 Old Barge Road Simsbury, CT Connecticut 06070 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/34] |
Former [2018/01] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17178958.9 | 30.06.2017 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | US201615200038 | 01.07.2016 Original published format: US201615200038 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263724 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3263724 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C22F1/10 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/38 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,US);
B22F3/15 (US);
B22F3/24 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | METALLURGISCHES VERFAHREN UND ARTIKEL MIT NICKEL-CHROM-SUPERLEGIERUNG | [2018/01] | English: | METALLURGICAL PROCESS AND ARTICLE WITH NICKEL-CHROMIUM SUPERALLOY | [2018/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MÉTALLURGIQUE ET ARTICLE AVEC UN SUPERALLIAGE DE NICKEL ET DE CHROME | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2017 | AL | 21.08.2019 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | IT | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 30.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015108599 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* page 17; table A *; | [A] - Raymond C. Benn ET AL, "Additively Manufactured INCONEL( ) Alloy 718 : Ott/Superalloy", Superalloy 718 and Derivatives, Hoboken, NJ, USA, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (20101006), pages 455 - 469, doi:10.1002/9781118495223.ch35, ISBN 978-0-470-94316-8, XP055414510 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9781118495223.ch35 |